EP3354345 - GRINDING SCREEN FOR A DEVICE FOR GRINDING BULK MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAAS Holzzerkleinerungs- und Fördertechnik GmbH Unter den Weiden 6 56472 Dreisbach / DE | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Volker Im Hofacker 4 56244 Hahn am See / DE | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 18162594.8 | 10.04.2014 | [2018/31] | Priority number, date | DE201310206449 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013206449 | [2018/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354345 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3354345 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B02C13/284 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
B02C13/284 (EP);
B02C13/13 (EP);
B02C13/282 (EP);
B27L11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZERKLEINERUNGSSIEB FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZERKLEINERN VON STÜCKGUT | [2018/31] | English: | GRINDING SCREEN FOR A DEVICE FOR GRINDING BULK MATERIAL | [2018/31] | French: | TAMIS DE BROYAGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE BROYAGE DE MATÉRIAUX AU DÉTAIL | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14001315.2 / EP2789391 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2014 | AL | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | MT | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | TR | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | LU | 10.04.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
TR | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 10.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 10.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.04.2014 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE472243 (ZEITZER EISENGIESSEREI, et al) [AD] 1,3* figure - *; | [Y]DE4008276 (NAGEMA VEB K [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 23 - line 35; figure 2 *; | [YD]DE19713264 (NOELL SERV & MASCHTECHN GMBH [DE]) [YD] 3,4 * column 2, line 47 - line 65 * * column 4, line 1 - line 30 * * figure - *; | [XY]JP2011251216 (ENDO KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 3-6 * [Y] 3,4,6 | by applicant | DE472243 | DE19713264 | CA2429244 |