EP3396360 - INSTALLATION FOR THE OPTICAL INSPECTION OF SURFACE REGIONS OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenmann SE Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röckle, Jürgen Friedenstr. 5 71106 Magstadt / DE | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 18162684.7 | 19.03.2018 | [2018/44] | Priority number, date | DE201710108770 | 25.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017108770 | [2018/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396360 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, G01N21/95, G01M11/08 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
G01N21/8806 (EP,CN,US);
G01M11/081 (EP,US);
G01N21/8803 (US);
G01N21/8914 (US);
G01N21/9515 (EP,US);
G01M17/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR OPTISCHEN ÜBERPRÜFUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENBEREICHEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2018/44] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR THE OPTICAL INSPECTION OF SURFACE REGIONS OF OBJECTS | [2018/44] | French: | INSTALLATION DE VÉRIFICATION OPTIQUE DES ZONES DE SURFACES DES OBJETS | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 25.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 31.07.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2019/40] | 03.08.2020 | Resumption of proceedings | [2019/51] | 31.07.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2019/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3712513 (ROTH ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5* figure -; claim - *; | [XY]DE19534145 (MUSCO CORP [US]) [X] 6,7 * column 4, line 6 - line 17 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 36; figure 2 * [Y] 1-5; | [XA]EP1376872 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [X] 6,7 * paragraphs [0013] , [0025] , [0028]; figure 4 * [A] 1-5; | [Y]US2013057678 (PRIOR CARRILLO MIGUEL ANGEL [ES], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0038]; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE102012216665 (WUERTH ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 6,7 * paragraphs [0037] , [0042] , [0043]; figures 4,6; claim 9 * [Y] 1-5; | [XA]DE102015008409 (EISENMANN SE [DE]) [X] 6,7 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042]; figure - * * paragraph [0058] * [A] 1-5 |