EP3542942 - REFLOW SOLDERING OVEN FOR SOLDERING AN ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEPSTRATEN, Gerardus Johannes Adrianus Maria c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois, 60025 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 18162764.7 | 20.03.2018 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3542942 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/008, B23K3/08 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B23K1/008 (EP);
B23K1/0016 (EP);
B23K3/08 (EP);
B23K2101/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLOW-LÖTOFEN ZUM LÖTEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN LEITERPLATTE | [2019/39] | English: | REFLOW SOLDERING OVEN FOR SOLDERING AN ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT BOARD | [2019/39] | French: | FOUR DE BRASAGE PAR REFUSION D'UNE PLAQUE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2018 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11233934 (SHINKO SEIKI) [X] 1,5-7,12,13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] *; | [XY]JP2007281272 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,12,13 * paragraph [0035]; figure 2 * [Y] 8-11; | [Y]EP3053691 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [Y] 8-11* figure -; claims 1-4 * |