EP3542897 - METHOD FOR TRANSESTERIFICATION OF CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FTOUNI, Jamal Vordere Hauptgasse 86 4800 Zofingen / CH | 02 /
WELKER, Matthias 11 Rue des Rossignols 68220 Hésingue / FR | 03 /
RENTSCH, Samuel Gurtengartenstrasse 1 3095 Spiegel bei Bern / CH | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18163580.6 | 23.03.2018 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3542897 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/02, B01J35/02, B01J35/10, B01J37/08, C01F11/06, C01F11/18, C07C67/03, C10L1/02, C01F1/00, C10L3/00, C10L3/10 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B01J23/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/03 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/082 (EP,KR);
B01J37/088 (EP,KR,US);
C01F11/06 (EP);
C01F11/185 (EP);
C10L1/02 (EP);
C10L1/026 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/14 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMESTERUNG VON CARBONSÄUREESTERN | [2019/39] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSESTERIFICATION OF CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTERS | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSESTÉRIFICATION D'ESTERS D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006134845 (DOSHISHA [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2189214 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [XI]JP5186606B ; | [XI]CN103977781 (UNIV GUIZHOU); | by applicant | WO0039222 | US2004020410 | WO2004083316 | WO2005121257 | WO2009074492 | EP2264108 | EP2264109 | EP2371766 | EP2447213 | EP2524898 | WO2013142473 | EP2840065 |