02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
17.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
15.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.03.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
22.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.08.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.12.2021 |
First examination report |
|
22.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
15.02.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
12.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.07.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
27.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|