06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
08.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
02.02.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2022 |
First examination report |
|
10.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.04.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
11.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
26.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|