EP3545806 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE REMOVAL OF SMALL PARTS FROM A FLUID STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fused Innovations GmbH Stormarnring 14 22145 Stapelfeld / DE | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerbracht, Tobias Scheidtstraße 71 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Ute Patentanwaltskanzlei Feldmann Leipziger Platz 15 10117 Berlin / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 18164246.3 | 27.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545806 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/10 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A47L9/10 (EP);
A47L9/104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON KLEINTEILEN AUS EINEM FLUIDSTROM | [2019/40] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE REMOVAL OF SMALL PARTS FROM A FLUID STREAM | [2019/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE PETITES PIÈCES D'UN ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0540458 (SIGURDSSON STEINN [IS]) [X] 1-11,15 * page 6, line 7 - page 6, line 57; figures 2-7 * [A] 12-14; | [A]DE20006284U (TOMKIEWICZ ANTONI [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6048249 (VANDENBERG ANTHONY PETER [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 61; figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB425960 (HOOVER LTD) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 66 - page 2, line 23; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | CA2282775 | EP0540458 | DE102012006561 | DE3722270 | DE69700584T | US6766558 | US7288129 |