EP3459567 - TUMOR CELL-SPECIFIC RESPONSIVE SELF-ASSEMBLING DRUG NANOCONJUGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Science and Technology 5 Hwarang-ro 14-gil Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02792 / KR | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kwangmeyung 5, Hwarang-ro 14 gil Seongbuk-gu 02792 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KWON, Ick Chan 5, Hwarang-ro 14 gil Seongbuk-gu 02792 Seoul / KR | 03 /
PARK, Juho 5, Hwarang-ro 14 gil Seongbuk-gu 02792 Seoul / KR | [2020/39] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
KIM, Kwangmeyung 5, Hwarang-ro 14 gil, Seongbuk-gu 02792 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
KWON, Ick Chan 5, Hwarang-ro 14 gil, Seongbuk-gu 02792 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
PARK, Juho 5, Hwarang-ro 14 gil, Seongbuk-gu 02792 Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18164779.3 | 28.03.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | KR20170121169 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170121169 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459567 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3459567 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/65, A61K47/69, A61K31/704, A61P35/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/704 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/67 (KR);
A61K47/6931 (CN);
A61K47/64 (KR,US);
A23L33/10 (KR);
A61K45/00 (CN);
A61K47/65 (EP,US);
A61K47/6929 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/51 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
A23V2200/25 (KR);
A23V2200/308 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | A61K47/65, A61K47/69 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TUMORZELLSPEZIFISCH REAGIERENDES SELBSTANORDNENDES ARZNEIMITTELNANOKONJUGAT | [2019/13] | English: | TUMOR CELL-SPECIFIC RESPONSIVE SELF-ASSEMBLING DRUG NANOCONJUGATE | [2019/13] | French: | NANOCONJUGUÉ DE MÉDICAMENT À AUTO-ASSEMBLAGE SENSIBLE SPÉCIFIQUE AUX CELLULES TUMORALES | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2018 | AL | 23.09.2020 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | IT | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SE | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | IE | 28.03.2021 | LU | 28.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 28.03.2018 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.03.2018 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 28.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004046169 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figure 3; example 6 *; | [Y] - Samuel Janssen ET AL, "Screening a combinatorial peptide library to develop a human glandular kallikrein 2-activated prodrug as targeted therapy for prostate cancer", Molecular Cancer Therapeutics, United States, (20041101), page 1439, URL: http://mct.aacrjournals.org/content/3/11/1439.short, XP055513754 [Y] 1-12 * whole document, in particular abstract, figure 4, table 3, page 1448, right-hand column, lines 16-18 * | [Y] - WANG MA ET AL, "Synergistic antitumor activity of a self-assembling camptothecin and capecitabine hybrid prodrug for improved efficacy", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, NL, (20170110), vol. 263, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2017.01.015, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 102 - 111, XP055448205 [Y] 1-12 * chapter 3.2;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2017.01.015 | [Y] - ZHIPENG CHEN ET AL, "Controlled release of free doxorubicin from peptide-drug conjugates by drug loading", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20141001), vol. 191, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2014.05.051, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 123 - 130, XP055176659 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2014.05.051 | by applicant | KR20030096356 | - MERRIFIELD, J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (19630000), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 54 | - STEWART et al., Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis, Pierce Chem. Co., (19840000), vol. 111 |