EP3547618 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A REDUNDANT COMMUNICATION CONNECTION AND FAIL-SAFE CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosch, Thomas Westring 12 90574 Roßtal / DE | 02 /
Laforsch, Jürgen Carl-Netter-Str. 6 77815 Bühl / DE | 03 /
Renschler, Albert Feldbergweg 4 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18164975.7 | 29.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3547618 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3547618 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
H04L12/40202 (EP,US);
G05B19/4184 (US);
G05B19/4186 (US);
G05B9/03 (CN);
H04L12/40176 (EP,US);
H04L12/40182 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINER REDUNDANTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG UND AUSFALLGESICHERTE STEUERUNGSEINHEIT | [2019/40] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A REDUNDANT COMMUNICATION CONNECTION AND FAIL-SAFE CONTROL UNIT | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UNE CONNEXION DE COMMUNICATION REDONDANTE ET UNITÉ DE COMMANDE SÉCURISÉE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 19.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | AT | 29.03.2023 | IE | 29.03.2023 | LU | 29.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | GB | 01.06.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
GB | 01.06.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5202822 (MCLAUGHLIN PAUL F [US], et al) [I] 1,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-6; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US2009265493 (MENDU KRISHNA R [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010030937 (SCHUERMANN MARTIN [DE], et al) [I] 1,2,15 * abstract * * page 1, column l, paragraph 4 - page 3, column l, paragraph 35; figure 1; claims 1,9-16 *; | [IY]EP2547045 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2,11-15 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 4, column 5, paragraph 32 * * figures 1-6; claims 1-4 * [Y] 3-7,10; | [YD]EP3051371 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 3-7,10* figure 1; claims 1-18 * | by applicant | EP2657797 | DE102013211406 | EP2881812 | EP3001647 | EP3051371 | EP20170181169 |