EP3406581 - DRY MIXTURE WITH GRAPHITE PARTICLES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHAPED ARTICLE FROM THIS DRY MIXTURE AND SHAPED ARTICLE MADE BY THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states kipan GmbH Stebener Weg 2 95119 Nalia / DE | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kipfelsberger, Angela Stebener Weg 2 95119 Naila / DE | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 18164984.9 | 29.03.2018 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | DE201710208905 | 26.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017208905 | [2018/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406581 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3406581 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/00, C04B28/04, C04B28/10, C04B28/12, C04B28/30 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B14/024 (US);
C04B28/001 (EP,US);
C04B28/105 (EP,US);
C04B28/12 (EP,US);
C04B28/30 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00181 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00258 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP);
C04B2111/00663 (EP);
C04B2111/94 (EP,US);
C04B2201/20 (EP,US);
C04B2201/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/001, C04B14/024, C04B14/18, C04B14/28, C04B14/28, C04B14/34 (EP);
C04B28/001, C04B14/024, C04B14/28 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/024, C04B14/18, C04B14/28, C04B14/28, C04B14/34 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/024, C04B14/18, C04B14/28, C04B14/34 (EP);
C04B28/105, C04B14/024, C04B14/18, C04B14/28, C04B14/28, C04B14/34 (EP);
C04B28/105, C04B14/024, C04B14/28 (EP);
C04B28/12, C04B14/024, C04B14/18, C04B14/28, C04B14/28, C04B14/34 (EP);
C04B28/12, C04B14/024, C04B14/28 (EP);
C04B28/30, C04B14/024, C04B14/18, C04B14/28, C04B14/28, C04B14/34 (EP);
C04B28/30, C04B14/024, C04B14/28 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMTEILS AUS EINER TROCKENMISCHUNG MIT GRAPHITPARTIKELN UND SO HERGESTELLTES FORMTEIL | [2018/48] | English: | DRY MIXTURE WITH GRAPHITE PARTICLES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHAPED ARTICLE FROM THIS DRY MIXTURE AND SHAPED ARTICLE MADE BY THIS METHOD | [2018/48] | French: | MÉLANGE SEC À PARTICULES DE GRAPHITE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE FORMAGE À PARTIR DUDIT MÉLANGE SEC ET ÉLÉMENT DE FORMAGE FABRIQUÉ SELON LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 07.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2018 | AL | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SE | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | TR | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
TR | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 23.06.2021 | |
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 23.06.2021 | |
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3207705 (HALL WILLIAM C) [X] 1 * column 1, line 68 - line 70 * * column 4, line 18 - line 34 * * pages 1-5 *; | [X]US3626149 (CARNEY PETER R, et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * example 5 *; | [X]FR2186878 (SERCI [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,10,13 * page 3, line 10 - line 18 * * claims 1,3-6 *; | [X]DE3821684 (WESTARP MARTIN DR [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,13 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO9600197 (ELFINCO SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12,13 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 4 * * claims 1-5,7-11,14-18 *; | [X]CN1282713 (WANG GANG [CN]) [X] 1-4,8,10 * the whole document *; | [X]CN101391878 (SHENGMAO QINGDAO ADVANCED MATE [CN]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [I]US2011024028 (IMMORDINO SALVATORE C [US], et al) [I] 1,14 * paragraph [0033] * * claim 1 *; | [I]DE102010010957 (H C CARBON GMBH [DE]) [I] 11 * paragraphs [0042] , [0060] ** claims 1,11,13,17,18 *; | [X]EP2426096 (BUEHLER ASTRID [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0060] , [0062] * | Examination | - Energieberater, "Mörtel", (20170501), URL: http://www.schulungsstelle-traunstein.de/Energieberatung/background/53040296650836f01/53040296660c4517a/index.html, (20190822), XP055614824 | - Vdz, "4 Hydratation des Zements und Gefüge des Zementsteins 4.1 Hydratation des Zements", VDZ Online KompendiumZementBeton, (20170501), URL: https://www.vdz-online.de/fileadmin/gruppen/vdz/3LiteraturRecherche/KompendiumZementBeton/1-4_Hydratation.pdf, (20190826), XP055615220 | - Diethelm Bosold ET AL, "Leichtbeton", Zement-Merkblatt Betontechnik B13, (20140601), URL: https://www.beton.org/fileadmin/beton-org/media/Dokumente/PDF/Service/Zementmerkblätter/B13.pdf, (20190912), XP055621770 |