EP3545835 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A TRAVELING FIELD FREE LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius-Maximilians-Universität Würzburg Servicezentrum Forschung und Technologietransfer Patente und Lizenzen Sanderring 2 97070 Würzburg / DE | [2021/17] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Julius-Maximilians-Universität Würzburg Servicezentrum Forschung und Technologietransfer Patente und Lizenzen Sanderring 2 97070 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogel, Patrick Otto-Hahn-Str. 77 97218 Gerbrunn / DE | 02 /
Rückert, Martin Fuchsstadter Str. 1 97234 Reichenberg / DE | 03 /
Behr, Volker Christian Am Happach 46/408 97218 Gerbrunn / DE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 18165054.0 | 29.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545835 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3545835 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A61B5/0515 (EP,US);
G01R33/1276 (EP);
G01R33/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER WANDERNDEN FELDFREIEN LINIE | [2021/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A TRAVELING FIELD FREE LINE | [2019/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER UNE LIGNE MOBILE LIBRE DE CHAMP | [2021/45] |
Former [2019/40] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER WANDERFELDFREIEN LINIE | ||
Former [2019/40] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER UNE LIGNE LIBRE DE CHAMP DE DÉPLACEMENT | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 16.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | IT | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | NL | 30.03.2022 | PL | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SE | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/35] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011021165 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 7, 9 * * page 15, line 7 - line 12 *; | [X] - "Chapter 3 Introduction of a Field Free Line for Magnetic Particle Imaging", Erbe, Marlitt, Field Free Line Magnetic Particle Imaging, Springer Vieweg, (20140312), pages 43 - 59, doi:10.1007/978-3-658-05337-6, ISBN 978-3-658-05336-9, XP002785347 [X] 1-15 * figures 3.5, 3.6c, 4.1, 4.4, 8.4, 8.6, 8.10, 8.14 * * paragraphs [03.2] , [ 3.4] , [04.3] , [ 4.5] , [ 8.2.1] , [ 8.2.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-658-05337-6 | [X] - CAN BARIS TOP ET AL, "Electronically rotated and translated field-free line generation for open bore magnetic particle imaging", MEDICAL PHYSICS., US, (20171201), vol. 44, no. 12, doi:10.1002/mp.12604, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 6225 - 6238, XP055511266 [X] 1,11 * figure 12 * * paragraphs [02.B] , [ 3.A] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mp.12604 | by applicant | - WEIZENECKER et al., "Magnetic particle imaging using a field free line", J. Phys. D: Appl. Phys., (20080500), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1088/0022-3727/41/10/105009, XP009137197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/41/10/105009 | - TOP et al., "Electronically rotated and translated field-free line generationfor open bore magnetic particle imaging", Medical Physics, (20171200), vol. 44 | - VOGEL et al., "Dynamic Linear Gradient Array for Traveling Wave Magnetic Particle Imaging", IEEE Transactions on Magnetics, (20180200), vol. 54 |