EP3546223 - LIQUID CARTRIDGE INCLUDING LIGHT BLOCKING PORTION AND SYSTEM USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2020/49] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya Aichi 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAO, Takahiro c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Akihito c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroaki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 04 /
KOBAYASHI, Tetsuro c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 05 /
NAKAZAWA, Fumio c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 06 /
NUKUI, Kosuke c/o Intellectual Property Dept. Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2021/16] |
Former [2019/40] | 01 /
MIYAO, Takahiro c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | ||
02 /
ONO, Akihito c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroaki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | |||
04 /
KOBAYASHI, Tetsuro c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAZAWA, Fumio c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | |||
06 /
NUKUI, Kosuke c/o Intellectual Property Dept. BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2019/40] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18165159.7 | 29.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546223 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546223 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B41J2/17503 (EP);
B41J2/17543 (EP);
B41J2/17553 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSPATRONE MIT LICHTBLOCKIERENDEM ABSCHNITT UND SYSTEM MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/40] | English: | LIQUID CARTRIDGE INCLUDING LIGHT BLOCKING PORTION AND SYSTEM USING THE SAME | [2019/40] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE LIQUIDE COMPRENANT UNE PARTIE DE BLOCAGE DE LUMIÈRE ET SYSTÈME L'UTILISANT | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 24.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2018 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008252702 (AOKI YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 18] - [0022] - [0 79] , [0 97] - [0099] - [ 107]; figure 11 *; | [A]EP3153320 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0023] , [0 24] , [0 30] , [0 31] , [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 48]; figure 6 *; | [A]EP3225401 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0 18] , [0 19] , [0 31] , [0 32] , [0 45] - [0048] - [0 51] , [0 58] , [0 66] , [0 75] , [0 82] - [0087]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP3228460 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 19] , [0 20] , [0 24] , [0 27] , [0 59] - [0061] - [0 82] - [0085]; figures 1-4 * |