EP3409578 - A THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, A COMPOSITE WING, AND A COMPOSITE WING SPAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Edward V. c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 18165160.5 | 29.03.2018 | [2018/49] | Priority number, date | US201715607962 | 30.05.2017 Original published format: US201715607962 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3409578 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3409578 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/18, B64C1/40, B64C9/00, B32B5/24, B32B5/18, B32B7/08, B64C1/00, // B32B27/06, B64D13/00, B64C3/26, B64C13/50, B64G1/50 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B32B7/08 (EP);
B64C3/182 (CN);
B64C3/36 (US);
B32B27/065 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B64C1/40 (EP,US);
B64C3/26 (EP,CN,US);
B64D13/006 (EP,US);
B64G1/50 (EP,US);
F28F13/14 (US);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2266/02 (EP);
B32B2307/302 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2605/18 (EP);
B32B5/02 (US);
B64C1/38 (US);
B64C13/50 (EP,US);
B64C2001/0072 (EP,US);
B64C3/18 (EP,US);
B64C9/00 (EP,US);
F28F2013/001 (US);
Y02T50/40 (EP);
Y02T50/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | B64C3/18, B64C1/40, B64C9/00, B32B5/24, B32B5/18, B32B7/08, B64C1/00, // B32B27/06, B64D13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/49] | B64C1/40, B64D13/00, B64G1/50, B64C3/18, B64C3/26, B64C1/00, B64C13/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Title | German: | THERMISCHES MANAGEMENTSYSTEM, FLÜGEL UND FLÜGELHOLM AUS VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2018/49] | English: | A THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, A COMPOSITE WING, AND A COMPOSITE WING SPAR | [2018/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE, AILE COMPOSITE ET LONGERON D'AILE COMPOSITE | [2018/49] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 02.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20197832.7 / EP3792175 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2018 | AL | 30.12.2020 | AT | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | ES | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | IT | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | MK | 30.12.2020 | MT | 30.12.2020 | NL | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SE | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | IE | 29.03.2021 | LU | 29.03.2021 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
MK | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 29.03.2018 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008277526 (WILLDIG VICTOR JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2009288814 (STOIA MICHAEL F [US], et al) [Y] 3 * claim 13 * [A] 1,2,4-15; | [A]FR2937304 (AIRBUS FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAYI]US2010321891 (STEENWYK MEREDITH MARIE [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0 43] * * figures 4,6 * [A] 2,4,6-15 [Y] 3 [I] 5; | [XA]EP2409914 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * figure 1 * [A] 2-10,12-15; | [XA]US2013187004 (CABALLERO FERNANDO CAMPO [ES], et al) [X] 1,4,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0 35] , [0 36] * * figure 3 * * claim 3 * [A] 2,3,5-10,12-15; | [A]WO2016088470 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |