EP3550314 - TESTING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENTLY TESTING HIGH-FREQUENCY COMMUNICATIONS DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corbett, Rowell Benediktenwandstr. 7 81545 München / DE | 02 /
Benoit, Derat Englschalkingerstr. 227 81927 München / DE | [2022/08] |
Former [2019/41] | 01 /
Corbett, Rowell Benediktenwandstr. 7 81545 Munich / DE | ||
02 /
Benoit, Derat Englschalkingerstr. 227 81927 Munich / DE | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/41] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18165370.0 | 03.04.2018 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550314 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550314 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3550314 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/317 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H04B17/19 (EP);
H04M1/24 (EP);
G01R31/31716 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TESTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EFFIZIENTEN TESTEN VON HOCHFREQUENZKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/41] | English: | TESTING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENTLY TESTING HIGH-FREQUENCY COMMUNICATIONS DEVICES | [2019/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ESSAI ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESSAI EFFICACE DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 03.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2018 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | ES | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | IT | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | NL | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | TR | 23.02.2022 | LU | 03.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 03.04.2018 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.04.2018 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.04.2018 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2318010 (SECR DEFENCE [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * page 1, line 28 - line 31 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 9 * * figure 2 * [I] 5-8,11-15; | [XI]JP2009055153 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,6,11-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 1 * [I] 3-5,7-10; | [A]US7539489 (ALEXANDER THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011059689 (HAVERTY JAMES D [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0173] *; | [I]US2013021912 (FINLOW-BATES KEIR [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]EP2656677 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP2889957 (RHEINFELDER CLEMENS [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0179] * * figure 15 *; | [A]EP2919508 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ ASIA PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016204881 (CHUNG YUAN-HWUI [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,9-11,14,15 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0056] * [I] 5-8,12,13 | by applicant | WO2016159632 |