Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3388593 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2019 | B1 | EP3388593 | 17.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1753128 | 10.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2771230T | 06.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1753128 | 10.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3065020 | 05.07.2019 | B1 | FR3065020 | 12.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1753128 | 10.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3388593T | 15.01.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | FR1753128 | 10.04.2017 |