EP3366143 - PROBIOTIC COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.J. Heinz Company Brands LLC One PPG Place Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Budelli, Andrea Largo Camussi 1 21013 Gallarate (Varese) / IT | 02 /
Fasano, Francesca Romana Via Diego Gianoli 15 23100 Sondrio / IT | 03 /
Terzano, Miryam Via Antonio Pigafetta 1 1-37138 Verona / IT | 04 /
Bramati, Lorenzo Via Cimabue 30 20900 Monza / IT | [2019/07] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
Budelli, Andrea Largo Camussi 1 21013 Gallarate (Varese) / IT | ||
02 /
Fasano, Francesca Romana Via Diego Gianoli 15 23100 Sondrio / IT | |||
03 /
Terzano, Miryam Via Lago di Como 14 36077 Altavilla Vicentina (Vicenza) / IT | |||
04 /
Bramati, Lorenzo Via Cimabue 30 20900 Monza / IT | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18166007.7 | 18.06.2012 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | US201161498910P | 20.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161498910 P | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366143 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/123, A23C9/152, A23C19/084 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A23C9/1234 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A23C9/123 (RU);
A23C9/127 (BR,US);
A23C9/1275 (RU);
A23C9/152 (RU);
A23L19/00 (BR,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,BR,US);
A23L7/10 (BR,US);
A23L7/104 (EP,BR,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A61P37/02 (EP,RU);
C12N1/205 (RU);
A23V2002/00 (BR,US);
A23V2400/165 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2018/35] | English: | PROBIOTIC COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2018/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS PROBIOTIQUES | [2018/35] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 27.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12803279.4 / EP2734049 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9929833 (ARLA EKONOMISK FOERENING [SE], et al); | [A]EP1364586 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [A]CA2761691 (NESTEC SA [CH]); |