Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11427436 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | B2 | US2019308846 | 10.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18166112 | 06.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110342366B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2023 | B | CN110342366 | 18.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18166112 | 06.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3549896 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18166112 | 06.04.2018 |