EP3549896 - ACTUATOR FOR ACTUATING A SAFETY GEAR OF AN ELEVATOR, WITH A RESETTING DEVICE FOR RESETTING THE ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/41] | RESETTING DEVICE FOR RESETTING AN ACTUATOR FOR ACTUATING A SAFETY GEAR OF AN ELEVATOR | ||
[2023/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSKINEN, Antti c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
HALLIKAINEN, Pekka c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
MÄKI, Antti c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
HARTIKAINEN, Petri c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 18166112.5 | 06.04.2018 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549896 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/18, B66B5/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B66B5/18 (EP,US);
B66B1/34 (CN);
B66B5/0087 (EP,US);
B66B5/044 (CN);
B66B5/22 (CN);
F16D59/02 (US);
F16D2121/22 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STELLGLIED ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER FANGVORRICHTUNG EINES AUFZUGS, MIT EINER RÜCKSTELLVORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKSTELLUNG DES STELLGLIEDS | [2023/40] | English: | ACTUATOR FOR ACTUATING A SAFETY GEAR OF AN ELEVATOR, WITH A RESETTING DEVICE FOR RESETTING THE ACTUATOR | [2023/40] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DESTINÉ À ACTIONNER UN PARACHUTE D'UN ASCENSEUR, AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉINITIALISATION POUR RÉINITIALISER L'ACTIONNEUR | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/41] | RÜCKSTELLVORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKSTELLUNG EINES STELLGLIEDS ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER FANGVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN AUFZUG | ||
Former [2019/41] | RESETTING DEVICE FOR RESETTING AN ACTUATOR FOR ACTUATING A SAFETY GEAR OF AN ELEVATOR | ||
Former [2019/41] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉINITIALISATION POUR RÉINITIALISER UN ACTIONNEUR DESTINÉ À ACTIONNER UN ENGRENAGE DE SÉCURITÉ D'UN ASCENSEUR | Examination procedure | 07.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 07.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007051563 (OH JAE-HYUK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0031] - [0037] *; | [XA]JP2009227353 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3,5,14,15 * abstract * [A] 4,6-13; | [XDA]US2011226560 (HUSMANN JOSEF [CH]) [XD] 1-3,5,6,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0088] , [0 89] * [A] 4,7-13 | by applicant | US2011226560 |