EP3392002 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, MEASURING APPARATUS, SYSTEM, INTERFERENCE DETERMINATION METHOD, AND ARTICLE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Daisuke c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 18166245.3 | 09.04.2018 | [2018/43] | Priority number, date | JP20170077728 | 10.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017077728 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3392002 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
B25J13/089 (US);
B25J9/1612 (EP,US);
B25J9/1666 (US);
B25J9/1676 (US);
G06T1/0014 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06T7/97 (US);
G06V20/64 (US);
G05B2219/39082 (US);
G05B2219/39083 (US);
G05B2219/39084 (US);
G05B2219/39393 (US);
G05B2219/40053 (US);
G05B2219/40613 (US);
G06V2201/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2018/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MESSVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, INTERFERENZBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND ARTIKELHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/43] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, MEASURING APPARATUS, SYSTEM, INTERFERENCE DETERMINATION METHOD, AND ARTICLE MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2018/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, APPAREIL DE MESURE, SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'INTERFÉRENCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLES | [2018/43] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 24.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1428634 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] * [I] 5-7,12-14,16; | [A]US2012029686 (BAN KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2015009314 | JP2016099257 | JP2002090113 |