EP3432226 - CONTROL PLANE ORGANISATION FOR FLEXIBLE DIGITAL DATA PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven KU Leuven Research & Development Waaistraat 6 Box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTHOOR, Francky c/o IMEC vzw, Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
RAGHAVAN, Praveen c/o IMEC vzw, Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
GARBIN, Daniele c/o IMEC vzw, Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 04 /
RODOPOULOS, Dimitrios c/o IMEC, Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 05 /
ZOGRAFOS, Odysseas c/o IMEC vzw, Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Winger Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [2023/44] |
Former [2019/04] | DenK iP Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 18166423.6 | 09.04.2018 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | EP20170182232 | 19.07.2017 Original published format: EP 17182232 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432226 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3432226 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G11C11/54, G06N3/088, G11C7/10, G11C13/00, G11C16/04, G11C17/16 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06F3/0646 (US);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/0673 (US);
G06N3/044 (US);
G06N3/045 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G11C11/54 (EP,US);
G11C13/0002 (EP,US);
G11C13/0061 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (EP,US);
G11C17/165 (EP,US);
G11C7/1006 (EP,US);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | G06N3/063, G11C11/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSEBENENORGANISATION FÜR FLEXIBLE DIGITALE DATENEBENE | [2019/04] | English: | CONTROL PLANE ORGANISATION FOR FLEXIBLE DIGITAL DATA PLANE | [2019/04] | French: | ORGANISATION DE PLAN DE COMMANDE POUR PLAN DE DONNÉES NUMÉRIQUE FLEXIBLE | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2230633 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - MIAO HU ET AL, "Dot-Product Engine for Neuromorphic Computing: Programming 1T1M Crossbar to Accelerate Matrix-Vector Multiplication", doi:10.1145/2897937.2898010, ISBN 978-1-4503-4236-0, (20160605), pages 1 - 6, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 53RD ANNUAL DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE ON, DAC '16, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/document/7544263/, (20181107), XP058259019 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2897937.2898010 | [A] - Shimeng Yu, "Neuro-inspired Computing Using Resistive Synaptic Devices", (20170421), URL: https://link.springer.com/book/10.1007/978-3-319-54313-0, (20181031), XP055520518 [A] 1-15 * Chapters 1, 9 and 12 * | [A] - MIAO HU ET AL, "Hardware realization of BSB recall function using memristor crossbar arrays", DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE (DAC), 2012 49TH ACM/EDAC/IEEE, IEEE, (20120603), doi:10.1145/2228360.2228448, ISBN 978-1-4503-1199-1, pages 498 - 503, XP032204631 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2228360.2228448 | by applicant | EP1958059 | EP1958059 | US2015058268 | EP3093995 | EP3144820 | - FURBER, S.B. et al., "The SpiNNaker project", Proceedings of the IEEE, (20140000), vol. 102, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/JPROC.2014.2304638, pages 652 - 665, XP011546624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2014.2304638 | - D. GARBIN et al., "Variability-tolerant Convolutional Neural Network for Pattern Recognition applications based on OxRAM synapses", IEEE International Electron Devices Meeting, (20140000), pages 28.4.1 - 28.4.4 | - G. W. BURR et al., "Experimental demonstration and tolerancing of a large-scale neural network (165,000 synapses), using phase-change memory as the synaptic weight element", IEEE International Electron Devices Meeting, (20140000), pages 29.5.1 - 29.5.4 | - K. ROY; M. SHARAD; D. FAN; K. YOGENDRA, "Brain-inspired computing with spin torque devices", 2014 Design, Automation & Test in Europe Conference & Exhibition (DATE, (20140000), doi:doi:10.7873/DATE2014.245, pages 1 - 6, XP032589417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7873/DATE2014.245 | - MEROLLA, P. A.; ARTHUR, J. V.; ALVAREZ-LCAZA, R.; CASSIDY, A. S.; SAWADA, J.; AKOPYAN, F.; JACKSON, B. L.; IMAM, N.; GUO, C.; NAKA, "A million spiking-neuron integrated circuit with a scalable communication network and interface", Science, (20140000), vol. 345, no. 6197, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1254642, page 668, XP055463342 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1254642 | - S. MORADI et al., "A Memory-Efficient Routing Method for Large-Scale Spiking Neural Networks", Eur. Conf. on Circuit Theory and Design (ECCTD, (20130900), pages 1 - 4 | EP20150167580 |