EP3389044 - MANAGEMENT LAYER FOR MULTIPLE INTELLIGENT PERSONAL ASSISTANT SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seon Man 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT Connecticut 06901 / US | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Liebigstraße 39 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Liebigstrasse 39 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18166830.2 | 11.04.2018 | [2018/42] | Priority number, date | US201715487347 | 13.04.2017 Original published format: US201715487347 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389044 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3389044 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22, G06F3/16, // G10L15/08 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/632 (KR);
G06F16/685 (EP,US);
G10L15/02 (KR,US);
G10L15/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | G10L15/22, // G10L15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] |
Former [2018/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MANAGEMENTSCHICHT FÜR MEHRERE INTELLIGENTE PERSÖNLICHE ASSISTENTEN | [2018/42] | English: | MANAGEMENT LAYER FOR MULTIPLE INTELLIGENT PERSONAL ASSISTANT SERVICES | [2018/42] | French: | COUCHE DE GESTION POUR SERVICES D'ASSISTANT PERSONNEL INTELLIGENT MULTIPLES | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 17.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2018 | AL | 11.12.2019 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | ES | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IE | 11.04.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | LU | 11.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.04.2018 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IE | 11.04.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IE | 11.04.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8239206 (LEBEAU MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 23 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 39 * * column 11, line 7 - line 21 * * column 12, line 19 - column 13, line 34 *; | [X]US2013085755 (BRINGERT BJORN ERIK [GB], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0062] *; | [XAI]US2016098992 (RENARD GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 92] * [A] 7 [I] 5,6; | [X]US2016260434 (GELFENBEYN ILYA GENADEVICH [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15* paragraphs [0037] , [0042] , [0045] , [0065] - [0067] - [0072] *; | [XA]US9508345 (MURGIA CARLO [US]) [X] 1-4,8-15 * column 4, line 14 - line 22 * * column 5, line 45 - line 53 * * column 8, line 4 - line 9 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 32 * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 3 * * figure 5 * [A] 5-7 |