EP3372280 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO VISUAL PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howard Foundation Holdings Limited 7 Marfleet Close Great Shelford Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB22 5LA / GB | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLAN, John 24 Bishopsfield Williams Town Waterford / IE | 02 /
BEATTY, Stephen Pembrokestown House Butlerstown Waterford / IE | 03 /
LOUGHMAN, James "Suantrai" Boston Road Ardclough Straffan, Co. Kildare / IE | 04 /
HOWARD, Alan 7 Marfleet Close Great Shelford Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 5LA / GB | 05 /
THURNHAM, David 46 High Street Little Wilbraham Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB21 5JY / GB | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 18167176.9 | 05.07.2012 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | GB20110011624 | 07.07.2011 Original published format: GB 201111624 | GB20110011625 | 07.07.2011 Original published format: GB 201111625 | GB20120007922 | 05.05.2012 Original published format: GB 201207922 | GB20120007923 | 05.05.2012 Original published format: GB 201207923 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372280 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3372280 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/02, A61K31/07, A61K45/06, A61K31/202, A23K20/179, A23K50/75, A23L33/105, A23L33/115, A23L33/15, A23L33/16, A23L15/00, A61K31/047, A61P43/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/047 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/07 (EP,GB,US);
A23K20/105 (US);
A23K20/179 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A23L15/00 (EP,US);
A23L15/30 (GB,US);
A23L29/256 (US);
A23L33/10 (US);
A23L33/105 (EP,GB,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K35/57 (US);
A61K35/60 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2200/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/00, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1586, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1598, A23V2250/1608, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1612, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/704, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/71, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/72 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/00, A23V2250/211 (US,EP);
A23V2200/00, A23V2200/30 (US);
A23V2200/00, A23V2250/00, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1586, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1598, A23V2250/1608, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1612, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/704, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/71, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/72 (US); |
Former IPC [2020/18] | A61P27/02, A61K31/07, A61K45/06, A61K31/202, A23K20/179, A23K50/75, A23L33/105, A23L33/115, A23L33/15, A23L33/16, A23L15/00, A61K31/047 | ||
Former IPC [2018/37] | A61P27/02, A61K31/07, A61K45/06, A61K31/202, A23K20/179, A23K50/75, A23L33/105, A23L33/115, A23L33/15, A23L33/16, A23L15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER SEHLEISTUNG | [2018/37] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO VISUAL PERFORMANCE | [2018/37] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES OU SE RAPPORTANT À DES PERFORMANCES VISUELLES | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/14] | 25.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12735605.3 / EP2729217 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2012 | AL | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 05.07.2012 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 05.07.2012 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
BG | 16.12.2020 |