blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3553107

EP3553107 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYURETHANE/POLYISOCYANURATE (PUR/PIR) RIGID FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.02.2020
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.03.2020  [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/42]
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/42]
Application number, filing date18167401.113.04.2018
[2019/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3553107
Date:16.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2018
ClassificationIPC:C08G18/50, C08G18/76, C08G18/16, C08G18/18, C08G18/22, C08G18/40, C08G18/42
[2019/42]
CPC:
C08G18/4216 (EP,US); C08G18/163 (EP); C08G18/1816 (EP,US);
C08G18/225 (EP); C08G18/4018 (EP,US); C08G18/4202 (EP);
C08G18/4211 (EP); C08G18/4238 (EP,US); C08G18/5021 (EP,US);
C08G18/6651 (US); C08G18/7664 (EP,US); C08J9/148 (US);
C08K5/0066 (US); C08K5/521 (US); C08G2101/00 (US);
C08G2110/0025 (US); C08G2110/0075 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHAN/POLYISOCYANURAT (PUR/PIR) - HARTSCHAUMSTOFFEN[2019/42]
English:METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYURETHANE/POLYISOCYANURATE (PUR/PIR) RIGID FOAMS[2019/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MOUSSES DURES DE POLYURÉTHANE/POLYISOCYANURATE (PUR/PIR)[2019/42]
Examination procedure30.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/12]
09.11.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/12]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4277571  (FALKENSTEIN GEORG, et al);
 [XA]DE3342176  (BASF AG [DE])
by applicantDE1247612
 DE1609668
 EP1359177
 WO2007025888
 EP1923417
 WO2010043624
 EP2216156
 WO2013107742
 WO2013107739
 EP2910585
 WO2017021463
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.