EP3415445 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anta Swiss AG Bundesstrasse 7 6304 Zug / CH | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREBEL, Matthias Jöchlerweg 7 6340 Baar / CH | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 18167417.7 | 16.04.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | CH20170000756 | 12.06.2017 Original published format: CH 7562017 | [2018/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415445 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/14, G09F9/37 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
B65F1/1405 (EP);
B65F1/14 (CH);
G09F23/00 (EP);
G09F7/04 (EP);
G09F7/22 (EP);
G09F9/375 (EP);
B65F2210/144 (EP);
G09F2007/005 (EP);
G09F2007/1852 (EP);
G09F2023/0025 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/51] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 12.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1191023 (NAYLOR JAMES PRIESTNALL [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 49 - line 86; figures 3, 5 *; | [Y]DE19758351 (INFOSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 54 - line 62 * * column 8, line 54 - line 68 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 21 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2009126473 (PORAT SHAI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] - [0011] - [0 13] , [0 15] , [0 26] , [0 30]; figures 1, 2 *; | [AD]EP2955133 (ANTA SWISS AG [CH]) [AD] 1-15* paragraphs [0016] , [0 40]; figures 1a, 2a * | by applicant | EP2955133 |