EP3556398 - PHYTATES FOR USE AS A BIOMOLECULES DELIVERY OR ADSORPTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Croda International PLC Cowick Hall Snaith Goole, East Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Croda Denmark A/S Elsenbakken 23 3600 Frederikssund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBLAD, Erik Frederiksberg Alle 19 B. 3. sal tv. 1820 Frederiksberg / DK | 02 /
DUROUX, Laurent Hvalsøvej 42 A 2 tv. 2700 Bronshøj / DK | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Karfopoulos, Alexis Theo Croda International Plc Intellectual Property Department Cowick Hall Snaith Goole, E York DN14 9AA / GB | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 18167427.6 | 16.04.2018 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556398 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K31/6615 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/6615 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHYTATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS EIN BIOMOLEKÜLEABGABE- ODER -ADSORPTIONSSYSTEM | [2019/43] | English: | PHYTATES FOR USE AS A BIOMOLECULES DELIVERY OR ADSORPTION SYSTEM | [2019/43] | French: | PHYTATES POUR UNE UTILISATION COMME SYSTÈME D'ADSORPTION OU D'ADMINISTRATION DE BIOMOLÉCULES | [2019/43] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005023176 (DELSITE BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [A]EP3162376 (UNIV ILLES BALEARS [ES]); |