EP3557495 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND EVALUATING COMMON CAUSE FAILURES OF SYSTEM COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaukewitsch, Christof Ludwigshöher Straße 44 81479 München / DE | 02 /
Heilmann, Reiner Am Feldl 23 85658 Egmating / DE | 03 /
Zeller, Marc Joseph-Haas-Weg 21c 81243 München / DE | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18167633.9 | 17.04.2018 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557495 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06F11/0706 (US);
G06F11/0772 (US);
G06F11/079 (US);
G06F11/0793 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND BEWERTUNG VON AUSFÄLLEN GEMEINSAMER URSACHEN VON SYSTEMKOMPONENTEN | [2019/43] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND EVALUATING COMMON CAUSE FAILURES OF SYSTEM COMPONENTS | [2019/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'ÉVALUATION DE DÉFAILLANCES D'ORIGINE COMMUNE DE COMPOSANTS DE SYSTÈME | [2019/43] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 19.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 22.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017139046 (PRESENSO LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-20* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-9; claims 1-18 * |