EP3488732 - FURNITURE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING A SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun-an Road, Hou-Hsiang Village Lu-Chu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | For all designated states King Slide Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Luke 9th Rd. Kaohsiung Science Park Lujhu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ken-Ching No. 299, Shun-an Road Hou-Hsiang Village Lu-Chu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | 02 /
LIANG, Hsiu-Chiang No. 299, Shun-an Road Hou-Hsiang Village Lu-Chu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | 03 /
WANG, Chun-Chiang No. 299, Shun-an Road Hou-Hsiang Village Lu-Chu Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18167736.0 | 17.04.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | TW20170141489 | 27.11.2017 Original published format: TW 106141489 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488732 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3488732 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/50, A47B88/49 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
A47B88/50 (EP,US);
A47B88/427 (US);
A47B88/467 (US);
A47B88/47 (US);
A47B88/49 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0054 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | MÖBELTEILANORDNUNG MIT VIBRATIONS-SENSING-GERÄT | [2019/22] | English: | FURNITURE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING A SAFETY DEVICE | [2019/22] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE PIÈCES DE MEUBLE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE VIBRATION | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 22.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2018 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | LU | 17.04.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 17.04.2018 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MK | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.04.2018 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003027816 (OKUDA SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,9,11-15 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US6550827 (TSUJINO JUN-ICHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-11 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JP2006194078 (HASHIZUME HIDEYA) [X] 1,4,5,7* figures 1-6 *; | [X]JP2013002215 (SYSTEC KYOWA KK) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2015240542 (AONO NOBUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-11 * figures 1-9 * |