EP3384925 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING HYPERLIPIDEMIA COMPRISING OXYNTOMODULIN DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanmi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 214 Muha-ro Paltan-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-958 / KR | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Sung Youb 109-105 World Meridian Uman-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si 442-190 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin-Sun 103-1501 Minsokmaeul Ssangyong Apt. 553 Bora-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si 446-954 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Jang, Myung Hyun 137-2403 Gangdong Lotte Castle First Apt. Amsa 3-dong Gangdong-gu 134-716 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Sang Hyun 107-306 Hyundai Apt. Oksu-dong Seongdong-gu 133-100 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Choi, In Young 105-1801 Byeoksan 1-cha Apt. Jukjeon 2-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si 448-755 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kwon, Se Chang 408-1804 Dogok Rexle Apt. Dogok 2-dong Gangnam-gu 135-506 Seoul / KR | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 18169490.2 | 25.07.2013 | [2018/41] | Priority number, date | KR20120081475 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120081475 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384925 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384925 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61K47/64, A61K47/60, A61K47/59, A61K38/22, A61P3/06, A61P1/16, A61P9/10 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (CN,IL,US);
A61K38/16 (IL,KR);
A61K38/22 (CN,IL,US);
A61K47/59 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/593 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/643 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/6435 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/68 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/6811 (EP,IL,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/04 (EP,IL);
A61P3/06 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P31/14 (EP,IL);
A61P31/20 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
C07K14/605 (IL,RU,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/22, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (CN) |
Former IPC [2020/13] | A61K38/22, A61K47/59, A61K47/60, A61K47/64, A61K47/68, A61P3/06, A61P1/16, A61P9/10 | ||
Former IPC [2018/41] | A61K38/22, A61K47/59, A61P3/00, A61P9/10, A61K47/68, A61K47/60, A61P1/16, A61P3/06, A61K47/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2018/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERLIPIDÄMIE MIT EINEM OXYNTOMODULINDERIVAT | [2018/41] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATING HYPERLIPIDEMIA COMPRISING OXYNTOMODULIN DERIVATIVE | [2018/41] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR TRAITER L'HYPERLIPIDÉMIE COMPRENANT UN DÉRIVÉ D'OXYNTOMODULINE | [2018/41] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 27.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13823727.6 / EP2884994 | Divisional application(s) | EP20188520.9 / EP3766520 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2013 | AL | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO2012169798 (HANMI SCIENCE CO LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-14 * page 1, paragraphs 1, 4 * * page 11, paragraph 153 ** page 17; table 1; sequences ID NO. 24-26 *; | [AP]WO2012173422 (HANMI SCIENCE CO LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-14 * page 25; table 1; sequences ID NO. 24-26 * * page 18, paragraph 220 * * page 1, paragraphs 1, 4 * * page 16, paragraph 204 * * page 17, paragraph 208 * | Examination | WO2011075393 | by applicant | WO9632478 | WO9734631 |