EP3560644 - A TOOL BODY AND A MILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattsson, Rikard Herrgårdsgatan 25 B 73246 Arboga / SE | 02 /
Karlsson, Kent Åviksvägen 4 73271 Fellingsbro / SE | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 18169829.1 | 27.04.2018 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560644 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560644 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/00, B23C5/06 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
B23C5/006 (EP,KR);
B23C5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2210/40 (EP,KR);
B23C2230/04 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2260/08 (KR);
B23C2260/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUGKÖRPER UND FRÄSWERKZEUG | [2019/44] | English: | A TOOL BODY AND A MILLING TOOL | [2019/44] | French: | CORPS D'OUTIL ET OUTIL DE FRAISAGE | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 30.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | IE | 27.04.2023 | LU | 27.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 27.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 27.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 27.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 27.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5984005 (HART SHANE P [US], et al); | [A]DE10053343 (HILTI AG [LI]); | [A]US6739808 (GHOSH RANAJIT [US]); | [AD]EP1654085 (NUBIUS GMBH PRAEZ SWERKZEUGE [DE]); | [I]US2007231088 (WAGGLE JAMES M [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1654085 |