EP3565135 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INVERTING A RADIO CHANNEL FOR BROADBAND SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köbele, Johannes Felicitas-Füss-Str. 92 81827 München / DE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/45] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18170041.0 | 30.04.2018 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565135 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565135 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3565135 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G01R29/0871 (EP);
H04B17/16 (US);
H04B17/0087 (CN);
H04B17/104 (US);
H04B17/12 (EP);
H04B17/364 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM INVERTIEREN EINES FUNKKANALS FÜR BREITBANDSIGNALE | [2019/45] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INVERTING A RADIO CHANNEL FOR BROADBAND SIGNALS | [2019/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INVERSER UN CANAL RADIO DE SIGNAUX À LARGE BANDE | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 11.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2018 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | LU | 30.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.04.2018 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.04.2018 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006009185 (SHAMSAIFAR KHOSRO [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12 * paragraph [0068] *; | [A]US2011200084 (GRIESING JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]EP2432073 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,9-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6-8,12-15; | [A]US8526550 (LAM LAWRENCE K [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014218240 (KPODZO ELIAS BONAVENTURE [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2014197185 (LITEPOINT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] * * figure 5 * [I] 3-8,13-15; | [A]EP3054743 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3293897 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - Ya Jing ET AL, "MIMO OTA Testing Based on Transmit Signal Processing", IEEE Instrumentation & Measurement Magazine, (20160601), pages 43 - 50, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=7477954, (20181106), XP055521500 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2015042336 |