26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
22.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
06.10.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
28.10.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.07.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.07.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
01.07.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
28.06.2022 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.05.2020 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.10.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.10.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
05.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
12.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.04.2018 |
Change - representative |
|