EP3564421 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING THREADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heberlein AG Bleikenstrasse 11 9630 Wattwil / CH | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landolt, Andrin Lönerenweg 8 8708 Männedorf / CH | 02 /
Rembold, Benjamin Lachernweg 30 8952 Schlieren / CH | 03 /
Haefeli, Roman Schwarzbachstrasse 91 8713 Uerikon / CH | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 18170364.6 | 02.05.2018 | [2019/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564421 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D02J1/08, D02G1/16, F15C1/22 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
D02J1/08 (EP);
D02G1/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON FÄDEN | [2019/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING THREADS | [2019/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DES FIBRES | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3158166 (WARREN RAYMOND W); | [A]US3247861 (PETER BAUER); | [XDI]DE2823335 (NORDDEUTSCHE FASERWERKE GMBH) | by applicant | US3016066 | US3636601 | US3638291 | DE2813368 | DE2823335 | WO2010086258 | EP2655710 |