EP3401215 - MULTI-COPTER LIFT BODY AIRCRAFT WITH TAIL PUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Autoflight Co., Ltd. B2, 288 Jinge Road Jinshan District Shanghai 201500 / CN | [2019/47] |
Former [2018/46] | For all designated states Pinnacle Vista, LLC 1826 Pinnacle Way Upland, CA 91784 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TU, Haofeng Room 108 No. 669 ShengGui Road Shanghai / CN | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2018/46] | Application number, filing date | 18171228.2 | 08.05.2018 | [2018/46] | Priority number, date | US201715589409 | 08.05.2017 Original published format: US201715589409 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3401215 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3401215 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/26, B64C29/00, B64C39/12, B64U10/20, B64U30/10, B64U50/13, B64U50/19, B64U50/30 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B64C27/26 (EP,US);
B64D27/24 (CN);
B64C27/82 (US);
B64C29/0025 (EP,US);
B64C39/12 (EP,US);
B64U10/20 (EP,CN,US);
B64U30/10 (EP,CN,US);
B64U50/13 (EP,CN,US);
B64U50/19 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/0202 (US);
G05D1/042 (US);
G05D1/0858 (US);
B64C2027/8236 (US);
B64U2101/30 (US);
B64U2101/60 (EP,CN,US);
B64U50/30 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | B64C29/00, B64C39/12, B64C27/26, B64C27/82, B64C39/02, G05D1/02, G05D1/04, G05D1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Title | German: | MULTI-COPTER-LIFT-BODY-FLUGZEUG MIT HECKPUSHER | [2018/46] | English: | MULTI-COPTER LIFT BODY AIRCRAFT WITH TAIL PUSHER | [2018/46] | French: | AÉRONEF À CORPS HYPERSUSTENTÉ MULTICOPTÈRE COMPORTANT UN POUSSOIR À LA QUEUE | [2018/46] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 14.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2604519 (YUNEEC TECHNOLOGY CO LIMITED [CN], et al); | [A]US2014231582 (HEADRICK SEAN [US]); | [A]WO2015145456 (MOOG INDIA TECHNOLOGY CT PRIVATE LTD [IN]); | [XI]US2016031554 (ESHKENAZY MAXIM [US], et al); | [I]US2016236775 (ESHKENAZY MAXIM [US], et al); | [I]US9586683 (BUCHMUELLER DANIEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US3038683 | US3181810 | US5419514 | US5823468 | US2003080242 | US2003094537 | US2006016930 | US2006226281 | US2010301168 | US2011001001 |