EP3416323 - A FEEDBACK METHOD FOR HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST AND AN APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yulong Computer Telecommunication Scientific (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-Tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Yulong Computer Telecommunication Scientific (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Mingju No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
Zhang, Yunfei No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 18171384.3 | 09.05.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | CN201710459657 | 16.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710459657 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416323 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/1812 (CN,US);
H04L1/1829 (CN);
H04L1/1864 (US);
H04L1/1896 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKKOPPLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HYBRIDE AUTOMATISCHE WIEDERHOLUNGSANFORDERUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/51] | English: | A FEEDBACK METHOD FOR HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST AND AN APPARATUS THEREOF | [2018/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉTROACTION DE DEMANDE DE RÉPÉTITION AUTOMATIQUE HYBRIDE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 10.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "CBG based (re)transmission, preemption indication and subsequent trasnmission in NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1708484, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273676 [X] 1-15 * page 1 - page 5 * | [XI] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Consideration on CB group based HARQ-ACK feedback", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707662 NR CBG HARQ-ACK_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051272869 [X] 1-3,6-12,15 * page 1 - page 2 * [I] 4,5,13,14 | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "On multiple HARQ bits per TB and feedback mechanism", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702738 ON MULTIPLE HARQ BITS PER TB AND FEEDBACK MECHANISM_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOL, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051209885 [X] 1-3,7-12,15 * page 1 - page 3 * [I] 4-6,13,14 |