EP3567440 - AUTOMATED CONFIGURATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL CONTROLLER BY MEANS OF A VERIFICATION TOKEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CODESYS Holding GmbH Memminger Straße 151 87439 Kempten / DE | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketterle, Kevin Am Prinzenbuckel 36a 87490 Börwang / DE | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18171418.9 | 09.05.2018 | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567440 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3567440 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/05 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP);
G05B19/4083 (US);
G05B19/056 (EP);
G05B19/406 (US);
G05B19/4185 (US);
G05B2219/31422 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE KONFIGURATION EINES INDUSTRIELLEN STEUERGERÄTS MITHILFE EINES VERIFIZIERUNGSTOKENS | [2019/46] | English: | AUTOMATED CONFIGURATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL CONTROLLER BY MEANS OF A VERIFICATION TOKEN | [2019/46] | French: | CONFIGURATION AUTOMATISÉE D'UN CONTRÔLEUR INDUSTRIEL AU MOYEN D'UN JETON DE VÉRIFICATION | [2019/46] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 12.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013024542 (KELLER MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0008] - [0016] - [0019] - [0032] , [0034] - [0042] - [0046] - [0051] - [0058]; figures 1,4,5,6 *; | [X]US2015287318 (NAIR SURESH R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0009] - [0012] - [0041] - [0067] - [0070] , [0071] , [0075] - [0087] - [0 93] , [ 102] - [0105] - [ 115] , [0116] * * paragraphs [0127] - [0129] - [0134] - [0137] - [0149]; figures 1,3,4,6,10 *; | [I]US2017220012 (HART MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0016] - [0021] - [0028] , [0029] , [0034] - [0040] - [0070] - [0096] - [0103] - [0107]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2017277920 (DEYOUNG DANIEL S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] , [0020] , [0026] , [0028] , [0035] , [0036] , [0038] , [0040] , [0042] - [0053]; figures 14,2,5 * |