EP3401840 - COMPRESSED DATA STREAMS IN OBJECT RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frobas GmbH Gebrüder-Eicher-Ring 45 85659 Forstern / DE | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUHARIK, Rastislav Narodnog Fronta 23D/208 21000 Novi Sad / RS | 02 /
VUKOBRATOVIC, Bogdan Balzakova 23/16 21000 Novi Sad / RS | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Neusser, Sebastian Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2018/46] | Application number, filing date | 18171784.4 | 11.05.2018 | [2018/46] | Priority number, date | DE201710110356 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017110356 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3401840 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
G06V10/94 (EP);
G06N3/063 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERTE DATENSTRÖME IN DER OBJEKTERKENNUNG | [2018/46] | English: | COMPRESSED DATA STREAMS IN OBJECT RECOGNITION | [2018/46] | French: | FLUX DE DONNÉES COMPRIMÉS DANS LA RECONNAISSANCE D'OBJET | [2018/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SONG HAN ET AL, "EIE: Efficient Inference Engine on Compressed Deep Neural Network", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160204), XP080681445 [X] 1,14,15 * point 4; page 2 * * page 3, column 2, paragraph last; figures 4,5 * * sec. "Activation Queue and Load Balancing"; page 4, column 2 * [I] 2-13 | [A] - REAGEN BRANDON ET AL, "Minerva: Enabling Low-Power, Highly-Accurate Deep Neural Network Accelerators", 2013 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PROGRAM COMPREHENSION (ICPC); [INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE.(ISCA)], IEEE, US, doi:10.1109/ISCA.2016.32, ISSN 1063-6897, ISBN 978-0-7695-3174-8, (20160618), pages 267 - 278, (20160824), XP032950665 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCA.2016.32 | [A] - CHEN YU-HSIN ET AL, "Eyeriss: An Energy-Efficient Reconfigurable Accelerator for Deep Convolutional Neural Networks", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 52, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2016.2616357, ISSN 0018-9200, (20170101), pages 127 - 138, (20170109), XP011638633 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2016.2616357 | [A] - Renzo Andri ET AL, "YodaNN: An Architecture for Ultra-Low Power Binary-Weight CNN Acceleration", (20160617), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1606.05487.pdf, XP055485030 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |