|
21.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.08.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.08.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
22 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.04.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
19 |
|
06.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
03.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
24 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
16.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2021 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |