Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4089245 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18172030 | 14.05.2018 | DE102017110856 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3404156 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2022 | B1 | EP3404156 | 21.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017110856 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017110856 | 06.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017110856 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3404156T | 14.11.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102017110856 | 18.05.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP4089245 |