EP3410607 - PROTECTIVE CASE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND MOBILE DEVICE FOR WIFI ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XING, Zheng Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Lei Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Zhenhua Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 18172085.5 | 14.05.2018 | [2018/49] | Priority number, date | CN201710399054 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710399054 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410607 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3410607 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/3805 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
H04B1/3805 (EP,US);
H04M1/18 (CN);
H04B1/3888 (US);
H04M1/0202 (US);
H04M1/21 (CN);
H04W88/08 (CN,US);
H04W84/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHUTZHÜLLE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND MOBILGERÄT FÜR WIFI ZUGANG | [2018/49] | English: | PROTECTIVE CASE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND MOBILE DEVICE FOR WIFI ACCESS | [2018/49] | French: | HOUSSE PROTECTICE POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTONIQUE ET PORTABLE POUR ACCÈS WIFI | [2023/34] |
Former [2018/49] | HOUSSE PROTECTIVE POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PORTABLE POUR ACCÈS WIFI | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 03.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013017788 (NORAIR JOHN PETER [US], et al); | [X]US2014065948 (HUANG DANIEL [US]); | [X]US2016315652 (TABATABAI MOHAMMAD [US], et al) | Examination | US2014085815 | US2015270734 | CN204906458U | US9300347 |