EP3570130 - RING-CLOSURES IN FAULT TREES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Industry Software NV Interleuvenlaan 68 3001 Leuven / BE | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖFIG, Kai Winzerer Strasse 7 80797 München / DE | 02 /
MENU, Jonathan Hambosstraat 21 3018 Wijgmaal / BE | 03 /
ZELLER, Marc Joseph-Haas-Weg 21c 81243 München / DE | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18172377.6 | 15.05.2018 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570130 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3570130 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G05B23/0248 (EP);
G06F11/079 (US);
G05B19/4155 (US);
G06F11/0736 (US);
G06F11/0751 (US);
G06F11/0793 (US);
G05B2219/42227 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RINGVERSCHLÜSSE IN FEHLERBÄUMEN | [2019/47] | English: | RING-CLOSURES IN FAULT TREES | [2019/47] | French: | FERMETURE DE BAGUES DANS DES ARBRES DE DÉFAUT | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 19.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2018 | AL | 16.12.2020 | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | DK | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | NL | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | RS | 16.12.2020 | SE | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | IE | 15.05.2021 | LU | 15.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 15.05.2018 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20110001566 (KOREA ATOMIC ENERGY RES [KR], et al) [A] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [A]US2015142402 (RAMESH ANAPATHUR V [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0 29] - [0035] *; | [AD] - LIM HO-GON ET AL, "Systematic treatment of circular logics in a fault tree analysis", NUCLEAR ENGINEERING AND DESIGN, (20111231), vol. 245, doi:10.1016/J.NUCENGDES.2011.12.016, ISSN 0029-5493, pages 172 - 179, XP028905343 [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [03.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucengdes.2011.12.016 | by applicant | - JOON-EON YANG; SANG-HOO HAN; JIN-HEE PARK; YOUNG-HO AN, "Analytic method to break logical loops automatically in psa", Reliability Engineering & System Safety, (19970000), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 101 - 105 | - HO-GON LIM; SANG-HOON HAN, "Systematic treatment of circular logics in a fault tree analysis", Nuclear Engineering and Design, (20120000), vol. 245, no. C, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nucengdes.2011.12.016, pages 172 - 179, XP028905343 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucengdes.2011.12.016 | - KAISER, B.; LIGGESMEYER, P.; MACKEL, 0., "A new component concept for FTs", Proceedings of the 8th Australian Workshop on Safety Critical Systems and Software, (20030000), vol. 33, pages 37 - 46 | - ZELLER, M.; HOFIG, K., "Incorporation of system and safety analysis models using a dedicated reference model", 2016 Annual Reliability and Maintainability Symposium (RAMS, (20160000), doi:doi:10.1109/RAMS.2016.7448074, pages 1 - 6, XP032889526 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RAMS.2016.7448074 | - "Automating compositional safety analysis using a failure type taxonomy for CFTs", MOHRLE, F.; ZELLER, M.; HFIG, K.; ROTHFELDER, M.; LIGGESMEYER, P., Risk, Reliability and Safety: Innovating Theory and Practice: Proceedings of ESREL 2016, (20160000), pages 1380 - 1387 |