EP3384903 - MICRO-PARTICLE CONTAINING THERAPEUTIC PROTEIN COATED WITH BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER FOR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MT | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US | [2020/16] |
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591-6706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Hunter 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY New York 10591 / US | 02 /
WALSH, Scott 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY New York 10591 / US | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/41] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18173299.1 | 18.11.2012 | [2018/41] | Priority number, date | US201161561525P | 18.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161561525 P | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384903 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384903 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K38/17, A61K39/00, A61P27/02, // A61K9/16 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/1623 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/5089 (IL,US);
A61K47/34 (IL,RU);
A61K9/5031 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (IL,RU);
A61K47/36 (IL,RU);
A61K9/14 (IL,RU,US);
A61K9/1611 (IL,US);
A61K9/1617 (IL,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/5047 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 18.03.2019 | ME | 18.03.2019 | Title | German: | MIKROPARTIKEL ENTHALTEND THERAPEUTISCHES PROTEIN BESCHICHTET MIT BIOABBAUBAREM POLYMER FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2018/41] | English: | MICRO-PARTICLE CONTAINING THERAPEUTIC PROTEIN COATED WITH BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER FOR MEDICAL USE | [2018/41] | French: | MICROPARTICULE CONTENANT PROTÉINE THÉRAPEUTIQUE RECOUVERTE AVEC POLYMÈRE BIODEGRADABLE POUR UTILISATION MÉDICALE | [2018/41] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 18.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12795967.4 / EP2790681 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | LU | 18.11.2020 | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/33] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03092665 (MASSACHUSETTS EYE & EAR INFIRM [US], et al); | [XI]US2008305115 (TICE THOMAS R [US], et al); | [XI]US2011104151 (NETTLES HEATHER [US], et al); | by applicant | US4210529 | US4304767 | US4764364 | US5968543 | US6063910 | US6927004 | US7087411 | US7279159 | US7365165 | US7572893 | US7608261 | US7655758 | US7807164 | US2010279933 | US2011171241 | US7998477 | WO2011US54856 |