EP3406854 - STATOR ASSEMBLY WITH RETENTION CLIP FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2018/48] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARAINCA, Brian 3 Chickadee Lane Kennebunk, ME Maine 04043 / US | 02 /
TREMBLAY, Dennis R. 5 Wilson St. Biddeford, ME Maine 04005 / US | 03 /
FEIGLESON, Steven J. 63 Kristina Ct. Waverly Hall, GA Georgia 31831 / US | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/39] |
Former [2018/48] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18173421.1 | 21.05.2018 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | US201715606191 | 26.05.2017 Original published format: US201715606191 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406854 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3406854 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (US);
F05D2230/64 (US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] |
Former [2018/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STATORANORDNUNG MIT HALTECLIP FÜR GASTURBINENMOTOR | [2018/48] | English: | STATOR ASSEMBLY WITH RETENTION CLIP FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2018/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE STATOR COMPORTANT UN CLIP DE RÉTENTION POUR MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 24.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2018 | AL | 23.09.2020 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | IT | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SE | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | TR | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | IE | 21.05.2021 | LU | 21.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.05.2018 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
TR | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 21.05.2018 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.05.2018 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1213483 (TECHSPACE AERO SA [BE]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; figure 4 *; | [XI]US2014356158 (BARNETT BARRY [CA]) [X] 1-4,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 3,9,12,13 * [I] 5,6; | [A]US2016053622 (FARAH JORGE I [US], et al) [A] 1,10,14* paragraphs [0054] , [0055] , [0062]; figure 2 * | Examination | GB2272027 |