EP3572200 - A METHOD FOR REINFORCING A ROTATIONAL-MOLDED TANK AND A ROTATIONAL-MOLDED TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cipax AB Stinsvägen 11 763 93 Skebobruk / SE | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUSTAFSSON, Anders Hantverkarvägen 10 763 43 Hallstavik / SE | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18173636.4 | 22.05.2018 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572200 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572200 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/06, B29D22/00, B29C63/18, B65D25/34, B65D1/12, B65D88/08, E03B11/00, B29C63/22, // B29L31/00, B29L9/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B29C41/06 (EP);
B29C63/18 (EP);
B65D90/06 (EP);
E03B11/00 (EP);
B29L2009/001 (EP);
B29L2031/7154 (EP);
B29L2031/7172 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG EINES ROTATIONSGEFORMTEN BEHÄLTERS UND ROTATIONSGEFORMTER BEHÄLTER | [2019/48] | English: | A METHOD FOR REINFORCING A ROTATIONAL-MOLDED TANK AND A ROTATIONAL-MOLDED TANK | [2019/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RENFORCEMENT D'UN RÉSERVOIR MOULÉ PAR ROTATION ET RÉSERVOIR MOULÉ PAR ROTATION | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2018 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | IE | 22.05.2021 | LU | 22.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | FR | 21.06.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.05.2018 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
TR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 22.05.2018 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.05.2018 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 21.06.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 22.05.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 22.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CA1283063 (PACCAR INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12,14,15 * page 4, line 15 - line 37; figure 3 * * page 1 * [A] 7,13 [I] 5,11; | [XA]US5430927 (ROGERS WILLIAM K [US]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * figures 1-6; claims 1-17 * * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4 - column 6 * [A] 7,13; | [XA]US2005129889 (DAVIS ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 8-12,14 * figures 2a-5a; claims 1-29 * [A] 1-7,13; | [A]US2014008372 (BARBER RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * |