Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
21.07.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.02.2021 | First examination report | |
18.02.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.05.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.05.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.05.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.10.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
25.05.2018 | Change - representative |