EP3573371 - OPTIMIZING A WIRELESS NETWORK THAT COMPRISES RANGE EXTENDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUKE BANDARA KARUNARATNE, Samurdhi Nokia Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
GACANIN, Haris Nokia Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 18174137.2 | 24.05.2018 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573371 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/14, H04W40/16, H04W40/12, H04L12/707, H04L12/703 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
H04W40/14 (EP);
H04L45/247 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04W40/12 (EP);
H04W40/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERUNG EINES DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKS MIT ENTFERNUNGSERWEITERUNGEN | [2019/48] | English: | OPTIMIZING A WIRELESS NETWORK THAT COMPRISES RANGE EXTENDERS | [2019/48] | French: | OPTIMISATION D'UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL COMPRENANT DES PROLONGATEURS DE PORTÉE | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015171953 (DJUKIC PETAR [CA], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]US2016302096 (CHARI AMALAVOYAL [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0121] *; | [X]US9705747 (XUE QI [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 12, line 24 - line 66; figures 5,14 * * column 27, line 33 - column 28, line 26 * |