EP3575131 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICALLY RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakran, Mark-Matthias Josef-Felder-Str. 66 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Böhmer, Jürgen Amselweg 18 90547 Stein / DE | 03 /
Helsper, Martin In der Windstube 5 90584 Allersberg / DE | 04 /
Krafft, Eberhard Ulrich Friedrich-Löffler-Straße 49 90419 Nürnberg / DE | 05 /
Laska, Bernd Sudetenring 20 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 06 /
Nagel, Andreas Gertrude-Neumark-Weg 14 90431 Nürnberg / DE | 07 /
Schönewolf, Stefan Hans Werner Rahm 20 90489 Nürnberg / DE | 08 /
Weigel, Jan Pfarrer-Merkel-Weg 5 91077 Großenbuch / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18174717.1 | 29.05.2018 | [2019/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575131 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L9/00, H02M1/12 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
B60L9/005 (EP);
H02M1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EIN ELETRISCH BETRIEBENES SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2019/49] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICALLY RAIL VEHICLE | [2019/49] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN VÉHICULE SUR RAIL ENTRAINE ELECTRIQUE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0585173 (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [I] 1-17 * figure 1 *; | DE69315395T [ ] (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [ ] * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102010044322 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]WO2017005863 (CONSTRUCTIONS ELECTRONIQUES + TELECOMMUNICATIONS [BE]) [A] 1,2,14 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]WO2018024407 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 3 * page 10, paragraphs 11-22 * * page 7, line 28 - line 36 *; | [T] - Anonymous, "Kurzschlussspannung - Wikipedia", (20181121), URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Kurzschlussspannung, (20181122), XP055526122 [T] 3 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] * | [T] - Anonymous, "S3L-Inverter - Wikipedia", (20181124), URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/S3L-Inverter, (20181126), XP055526737 [T] 12 | [XA] - MEYER M, "AKTIVE STOERSTROMFILTER FUER DIE NETZSEITE VON UMRICHTERLOKOMOTIVEN", EB- ELEKTRISCHE BAHNEN, DIV-DEUTSCHER INDUSTRIEVERLAG, (19930301), vol. 91, no. 3, ISSN 0013-5437, pages 80 - 84,86, XP000363201 [X] 1 * page 84 * [A] 17 |