EP3425048 - CHIMERIC ALKALINE PHOSPHATASE-LIKE PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AM-Pharma B.V. Rumpsterweg 6 3981 AK Bunnik / NL | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raaben, Willem Kaasjeskruid 2 3824 NW Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
Jonk, Luigi Johannes Cornelius Van Lynden van Sandenburglaan 2 3571 BC Utrecht / NL | 03 /
Van den Berg, Erik Jan Bosscheweg 61 5261 AC Vught / NL | 04 /
van Elsas, Andrea Ruusbroecgaarde 139 5343 JL Oss / NL | 05 /
Millán, José Luis 10858 Caminito Alto San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 18174759.3 | 26.01.2015 | [2019/02] | Priority number, date | EP20140152526 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: EP 14152526 | EP20140188158 | 08.10.2014 Original published format: EP 14188158 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425048 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/16 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N15/52 (RU);
C12Y301/00 (EP,US);
C12Y301/03001 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | 29.05.2018 | ME | 29.05.2018 | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE ALKALISCHE PHOSPHATASEARTIGE PROTEINE | [2019/02] | English: | CHIMERIC ALKALINE PHOSPHATASE-LIKE PROTEINS | [2019/02] | French: | PROTÉINES DE TYPE PHOSPHATASE D'ALCALINE CHIMÉRIQUES | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 10.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 16.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15703642.7 / EP3097189 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004056987 (UNIV GRONINGEN [NL], et al); | [A]WO2012169892 (AM PHARMA BV [NL], et al) | by applicant | WO2008133511 |