EP3576048 - ADAPTIVE WINDOW GENERATION FOR MULTI-ENERGY X-RAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTMAN, Shlomo c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ROMMAN, Zimam c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18174851.8 | 29.05.2018 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576048 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G06T5/90 (EP);
G06T2207/10081 (EP);
G06T2207/10116 (EP);
G06T2207/20092 (EP);
G06T2207/30004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE FENSTERGENERIERUNG FÜR MULTI-ENERGIE-RÖNTGENAUFNAHMEN | [2019/49] | English: | ADAPTIVE WINDOW GENERATION FOR MULTI-ENERGY X-RAY | [2019/49] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE FENÊTRE ADAPTATIVE POUR RADIOGRAPHIE MULTI-ÉNERGIE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004170308 (BELYKH IGOR [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]WO2010113047 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US2015287188 (GAZIT TIFERET T [IL], et al) [Y] 5,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0062] *; | [Y]WO2017013514 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * page 6, line 29 *; | [XYI]EP3138497 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 18] , [0 41] - [0053] * [Y] 5,8 [I] 2,6,11 | by applicant | - "Qualitative Comparison of Noncontrast Head Dual-Energy Computed Tomography using Rapid Voltage Switching Technique and Conventional Computed Tomography", WILLIAM D.; HWANG, MD, Journal of Computer Assisted Tomography'', J. Comput. Assist. Tomogr., Wolters Kluwer Health, Inc., (20160300), vol. 40, pages 320 - 325 |