EP3574836 - TEMPORALLY GATED THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASS, Michael c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KOEHLER, Thomas c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18175000.1 | 30.05.2018 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3574836 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, G06T11/00 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
A61B6/5288 (EP);
A61B6/541 (US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/5223 (EP,US);
A61B6/5264 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US);
G06T11/008 (US);
A61B6/486 (EP);
A61B6/488 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEITGESTEUERTE DREIDIMENSIONALE BILDGEBUNG | [2019/49] | English: | TEMPORALLY GATED THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGING | [2019/49] | French: | IMAGERIE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE À DÉCLENCHEMENT PÉRIODIQUE TEMPOREL | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012078089 (WOLLENWEBER SCOTT DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-7 *; | [XD]US2016113614 (CETINGUL HASAN ERTAN [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,7,9-15 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0072] *; | [X] - KUNTZ J ET AL, "Fully automated intrinsic respiratory and cardiac gating for small animal CT", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20100407), vol. 55, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 2069 - 2085, XP020171857 [X] 1-3,7,10-15 * page 2071 - page 2078 * | by applicant | US2016113614 |