EP3410483 - PACKAGE AND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böttcher, Mathias Waldhofstrasse 22 01109 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Wolf, M. Jürgen Erich-Weinert-Strasse 6 10439 Berlin / DE | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 18175313.8 | 31.05.2018 | [2018/49] | Priority number, date | DE201710209249 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017209249 | [2018/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410483 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/18, H01L25/065, H01L23/31, H01L23/498, H01L21/56, H01L21/98, // H01L25/10 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
H01L25/065 (EP);
H01L21/6835 (EP);
H01L23/49833 (EP);
H01L25/105 (EP);
H01L25/18 (EP);
H01L25/50 (EP);
H01L2221/68345 (EP);
H01L2221/68359 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/81005 (EP);
H01L2224/85005 (EP);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L2225/1023 (EP);
H01L2225/1041 (EP);
H01L2225/1058 (EP);
H01L2225/1088 (EP);
H01L2225/1094 (EP);
H01L23/3128 (EP);
H01L23/49816 (EP);
H01L2924/1421 (EP);
H01L2924/1431 (EP);
H01L2924/15192 (EP);
H01L2924/15311 (EP);
H01L2924/1532 (EP);
H01L2924/1533 (EP);
H01L2924/19042 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/85 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2018/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PACKAGES UND PACKAGE | [2018/49] | English: | PACKAGE AND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACKAGE | [2018/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PAQUET ET PAQUET | [2018/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 05.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5570274 (SAITO MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,12,15 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 56; figure 9 * * column 7, lines 18-22 * * column 9, lines 21-39 * [I] 13,14; | [X]US2008139013 (TOMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12,15 * paragraphs [0172] , [ 175] - [0182] - [0199] - [0202]; figure 20 *; | [X]US7675151 (BOONE ALAN P [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8,12,15 * column 8, lines 27-31; figure 6 *; | [X]US2014077361 (LIN YAOJIAN [SG], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,15 * paragraphs [0080] - [0101]; figures 7a-10 *; | [X]WO2016007120 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-7,11,12,15* figures 1-10 * |